Wallace v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Antonio Jeremain Wallace
Defendant: Ronald Reagan, Alabama Department of Corrections and Thomas E. Kilby
Case Number: 2:2019cv00854
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDMENT (My Claim Monetary Relief) TO #1 COMPLAINT, filed by Antonio Jeremain Wallace.(am, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antonio Jeremain Wallace. (am, )
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION DIRECTING payment of initial partial filing fee of $8.33; GRANTING an extension from 12/3/2019 to and including 12/10/2019 to forward to the Clerk of this Court the initial partial filing fee of $8.33, as further set out in Order; ORDERING that other than the change in the amount of the initial partial filing fee due from the plaintiff the directives of the #3 order entered on 11/8/2019 remain in full force and effect. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/21/2019. (Furnished to Cashier)(am, )
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION DENYING the #4 Motion for release from prison custody. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/21/2019. (am, ) Modified on 11/22/2019 to correct pleading title as reflected in pleading (am, ).
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antonio Jeremain Wallace. (am, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to be Released from Prison Custody by Antonio Jeremain Wallace. (am, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $14.83 be paid on or before 12/3/2019; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; GRANTING the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order, as further set out in Order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/8/2019. (Furnished to Cashier) (am, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Antonio Jeremain Wallace. (es, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Thomas E. Kilby, Ronald Reagan, filed by Antonio Jeremain Wallace.(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Kilby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Jeremain Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?