Nekouee v. Apple of North Alabama, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Defendant: Apple of North Alabama, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00864
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181Americans
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on authorized business agent on 12/18/19, filed by Fred Nekouee. (Rotbart, Brandon)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple of North Alabama, Inc. and returned to counsel Doman for personal service by process server on the defendant. (djy, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Conflict Disclosure Statement re: #3 Notice of Defiency by Fred Nekouee. (Rotbart, Brandon) Modified on 11/21/2019 to add linkage and clarify docket text as reflected in pleading(am, ).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING the #2 Motion for Admission of Brandon A. Rotbart, Esq., pro hac vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/18/2019. (am, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Fred Nekouee; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandon A. Rotbart, filed by Fred Nekouee. (Filing fee $75.00 receipt number 4602055647.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(am, ) Modified on 11/18/2019 to add attorney's name (am, ).
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple of North Alabama, Inc., filed by Fred Nekouee (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602055646.). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nekouee v. Apple of North Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple of North Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Represented By: Patrick Lyle Doman
Represented By: Brandon Alan Rotbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?