Price-Rodgers v. Celink's Reverse Mortgage (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Sherell M. Price-Rodgers
Defendant: Celink's Reverse Mortgage
Case Number: 2:2019cv00937
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Denzel Efemena Okinedo on behalf of Celink's Reverse Mortgage (Okinedo, Denzel)
January 21, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sherell M. Price-Rodgers re #15 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(cnw, )
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that the #14 motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before January 21, 2020.1 Defendant may file a reply to the response on or before January 28, 2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/9/2020. (kh, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Sherell M. Price-Rodgers; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Deadline (Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Memorandum for Motion to Dismiss) re #8 Order to Show Cause, by Sherell M. Price-Rodgers. (cnw, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Celink's Reverse Mortgage re #8 Order to Show Cause, (Threadcraft, Joshua) Modified on 1/6/2020 to clarify text (cnw, ).
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Celink's Reverse Mortgage re #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Threadcraft, Joshua)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Additional Time to File Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Disclosure Statement. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/17/2019. (cnw, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Celink's Reverse Mortgage. (Threadcraft, Joshua)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #8 Order to Show Cause, signed by Sherell Price, served on 12/13/2019.(cnw, )
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING that on or before 12/30/2019 Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion and show cause why the motion should not be granted; Defendant may file a reply on or before 1/6/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/12/2019. (am, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Celink's Reverse Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Foreclosure Deed)(Threadcraft, Joshua)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Celink's Reverse Mortgage. (Threadcraft, Joshua)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond toComplaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/11/19. (djy, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint /Response to Complaint by Celink's Reverse Mortgage. (Threadcraft, Joshua)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/5/2019. (wcl, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Celink's Reverse Mortgage; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
December 2, 2019 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Celink's Reverse Mortgage. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
December 2, 2019 COMPLAINT against Celink's Reverse Mortgage filed by Sherell M. Price-Rodgers. (NO PDF - See doc #1 )(am, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Celink's Reverse Mortgage from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-CV-2019-000521.00. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602055901) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price-Rodgers v. Celink's Reverse Mortgage (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celink's Reverse Mortgage
Represented By: Joshua Howard Threadcraft
Represented By: Denzel Efemena Okinedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherell M. Price-Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?