Wilkins v. McCallan et al
Plaintiff: Carly B. Wilkins
Defendant: SigMed, LLC and Peter C. McCallan
Debtor: Timothy Thomas McCallan
Case Number: 2:2019mc03868
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the #1 motion to withdraw reference is set for submission, without oral argument, on 6/27/2019, with all briefs due by said date. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/20/2019. (alm, )
June 19, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE #8 CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - ***Attorney Luther Graves Stiff, III for Peter C. McCallan & for SigMed, LLC added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Peter C. McCallan, SigMed, LLC re #7 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Keenan, George) Modified on 6/20/2019 to add as also filed on behalf of SigMed, LLC (alm, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Peter C. McCallan & SigMed, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Carly B. Wilkins re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Olen, Stephen) Modified on 6/5/2019 to add the link to the #5 Notice (alm, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Carly B. Wilkins; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Peter C. McCallan & SigMed, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Carly B. Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Olen, Stephen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. (Attachments: # 1 USBC Docket Sheet Adv Proceeding #16-01138). (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket Sheet Adversary Proceeding 18-03089)(dmn, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Peter C. McCallan, SigMed, LLC. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. McCallan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SigMed, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Charles Olen
Represented By: George Matthew Keenan
Represented By: Luther Graves Stiff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter C. McCallan
Represented By: Stephen Charles Olen
Represented By: George Matthew Keenan
Represented By: Luther Graves Stiff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carly B. Wilkins
Represented By: Carly B. Wilkins
Represented By: Stephen Charles Olen
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Timothy Thomas McCallan
Represented By: Michael Aaron Fritz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?