United States of America v. Taylor-Watson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tonya Taylor-Watson
Garnishee: Herndon Oil Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019mc03883
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, #9 Order sent to Tonya Taylor-Watson was returned with the following notation, "Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward". (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
September 16, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #7 Order sent to Tonya Taylor-Watson was returned with the following notation, "Return to sender, vacant, unable to forward". (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO GARNISHEE: Upon consideration of the United States' #8 Motion for Entry of Final Disposition Order, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; Accordingly, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) Garnishee, Herndon Oil Corporation, shall withhold 25% from Defendant Tonya Taylor-Watson disposable earnings each week and shall promptly remit the identified nonexempt funds every pay period to the Clerk of the Court, One Church Street, Suite B-110, Montgomery, AL 36104; and (2) The Clerk of the Court shall apply these funds to the restitution balance owed by the Defendant, Tonya Taylor-Watson; It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 USC 3205(c)(10), this garnishment shall remain in effect until satisfaction of the debt owed to Plaintiff, until Defendant ceases employment with the Garnishee (unless the Garnishee reinstates or reemploys Defendant within 90 days after Defendant's dismissal or resignation), or by order of this court quashing the Writ of Garnishment; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to administratively close this action subject to reopening for good cause shown; The administrative closure does not affect the validity of the continuing Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/12/2019.(kr, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Final Disposition Order by United States of America. (Neeley, Robert) Modified on 9/11/2019 to clarify the docket text (cnw, ).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 9/26/2019, the Government shall file a motion for the entry of an appropriate disposition order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/10/2019. (kr, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 US Marshals ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 8/8/2019 as to Herndon Oil Corporation re #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #3 Writ of Garnishment. (kr, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 US Marshals ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 8/8/2019 as to Tonya Taylor-Watson re #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #3 Writ of Garnishment. (kr, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Herndon Oil Corporation. (kr, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (kr, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (kr, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Taylor-Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Taylor-Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Herndon Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?