United States of America v. Moses et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Yolanda Moses
Garnishee: Aerotek Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019mc03892
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Unxecuted as to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, & #3 Writ of Garnishment, as to Yolanda Moses, with the following notations: "8/26/2019: No one at the residence", "9/20/19: No answer at the door", "9/30/2019: no answer".(amf, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Aerotek Inc.. (wcl, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, #3 Writ of Garnishment, served on Kelly Webster for Aerotek, Inc. on 8/21/2019. (wcl, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued and furnished to US Marshal for service. (wcl, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (wcl, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ of Garnishment, #5 Garnishee Answer Form)(wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Moses et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Aerotek Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?