In Re: Subpoena Issued by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio to Melissa Brown, a Resident of the Middle District of Alabama, Northern Division (MAG+)
Petitioner: Melissa Brown
In Re: Subpoena Issues by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio to Melissa Brown, a Resident of the Middle District of Alabama, Northern Division and Subpoena Issued by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio to Melissa Brown, a Resident of the Middle District of Alabama, Northern Division
Case Number: 2:2019mc03894
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Emily C Marks
3 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING the #1 Motion to Quash Federal Subpoena, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/24/2019. (am, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay Subpoena to Melissa Brown; The current stay of this case is extended to stay the federal subpoena issued to Melissa Brown by Plf Cleveland Jackson. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/27/2019. (amf, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Subpoena to Melissa Brown by All Plaintiffs. (Bohnert, Allen) Modified on 9/27/2019 to clarify the docket text (qc/wcl, ).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Upon notification that the evidentiary hearing previously scheduled in In re Ohio Execution Protocol Litigation (Case No. 2:11-cv-1016 pending in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio) has been vacated, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is STAYED pending the outcome of an appeal of the order vacating that hearing. It is further ORDERED that upon consideration of Plaintiffs Motion to Continue Deadline to Show Cause (Doc. #8 ) the motion is GRANTED and the Plaintiffs response time is hereby held in abeyance. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/20/2019. (dmn, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Plaintiff Cleveland Jackson's Motion to Continue Deadline to Show Cause (ECF No. 7) by All Plaintiffs. (Bohnert, Allen)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING that Plaintiff Cleveland Jackson, the party in the underlying Ohio lawsuit who issued the subpoena, shall SHOW CAUSE on or before Twelve Noon CST on 9/20/2019 why the Motion to Quash should not be granted; DIRECTING the Clerk to serve this Order on the following individuals by email and first-class mail at the addresses set out in the certificate of service in the Motion to Quash: 1) Paul R. Bottei & 2) Allen L. Bohnert. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/16/2019. (am, ) Modified on 9/16/2019 to include: mailed & e-mailed to counsel as directed (am, ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Correction re #4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement to correct the erroneous main PDF document previously attached by E-Filer (Attachments: #1 Corrected main document to docket entry #4 )(djy, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case is REFERRED to the United States Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/13/2019. (am, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Melissa Brown re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bailey, Dennis) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/13/2019 to correct the erroneous main PDF document previously attached by E-Filer) (qc/djy, ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Melissa Brown; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson, Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case. (djy, )
September 13, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Doyle, case reassigned: #1 MOTION to Quash (djy, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Ohio Federal Subpoena directing Melissa Brown to provide deposition testimony in Montgomery, Alabama by Melissa Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 fee receipt no. 4602054866 $47.00)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Subpoena Issued by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio to Melissa Brown, a Resident of the Middle District of Alabama, Northern Division (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Subpoena Issues by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio to Melissa Brown, a Resident of the Middle District of Alabama, Northern Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Subpoena Issued by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio to Melissa Brown, a Resident of the Middle District of Alabama, Northern Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melissa Brown
Represented By: John Evans Bailey
Represented By: Dennis Ray Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?