United States of America v. Jan
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mohammad Haroon Jan and Mohammad Haroon
Case Number: 2:2020cv00033
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 8 U.S.C. ยง 1451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT JUDGMENT: it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED as follows: (1) The #5 Joint Motion for Consent Judgment is GRANTED; (2) In accordance with the #5 Joint Motion for Consent Judgment, judgment is ENTERED in favor of the United States and against Dft; (3) The Court FINDS and DECLARES that Dft procured his US citizenship by concealment of a material fact or willful misrepresentation; (4) The order admitting Dft to US citizenship is REVOKED and SET ASIDE effective as of the original date of the order, 4/19/2008; (5) Certificate of Naturalization No. 30461569 is CANCELED, effective as of the original date of the certificate, 4/19/2008; (6) Dft is forever RESTRAINED and ENJOINED from claiming any rights, privileges, benefits, or advantages under any document which evidences US citizenship obtained as a result of his 4/19/2008 naturalization; (7) Dft shall, within 10 days of this Order, surrender and deliver his Certificate of Naturalization, any and all US passports and passport cards, and any other indicia of US citizenship (including, but not limited to: voter registration cards and other relevant documents, whether current or expired), as well as any copies thereof in his possession or control-and to make good faith efforts to recover and then surrender any copies thereof that he knows are in the possession or control of others-to Counsel for the United States, Stephanie E. Beckett; DIRECTING the Clerk to serve this notice on Defendant at the email address shahji40@gmail.com. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 2/28/2020. (bes, ) Modified on 2/28/2020 to reflect as emailed to Jan, as directed. (bes, ).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #5 -1 Motion for a Telephonic Hearing; granting #5 -2 joint Motion for consent judgment; Dft's naturalization is hereby REVOKED and a separate consent judgment will be entered to that effect; DIRECTING the Clerk to serve this notice on Dft at the email address shahji40@gmail.com. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 2/28/2020. (bes, ) Modified on 2/28/2020 to reflect as emailed to Jan, as directed. (bes, ).
February 25, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher: Motion Hearing held on 2/25/2020 re #5 Joint MOTION for Hearing (telephonic), Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment. (NO PDF available). (Recording Time 9:00-9:30.) (dh)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to appear telephonically; Call-in information will be provided to counsel separately from this order; DIRECTING the Clerk to serve this notice on Dft at the email address shahji40@gmail.com (Found in Consent to Email Service at Doc. #4 -1). Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 01/30/2020. (bes, ) Modified on 1/30/2020 to reflect as emailed to Jan, as directed. (bes, ).
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to appear telephonically by United States of America. (Beckett, Stephanie)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction re #6 Order to correct erroneous PDF document to include email directive to def Jan (Attachments: #1 corrected main document to Docket entry #6 )(djy, )
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re #5 Joint MOTION for Consent Judgment: it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on the Joint Motion for Consent Judgment on 2/25/2020, at 9 AM in Courtroom 2E; Due to Dft's current location, he will be permitted to call in to the hearing. Call-in information will be provided to counsel separately from this order; The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide a court reporter for this hearing and to serve this notice on defendant at the email address shahji40@gmail.com. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 01/23/2020. (Furn: Calendar, dh)(bes, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/23/2020 to correct erroneous PDF document to include email directive to def Jan). Emailed to Jan, as directed. (qc/djy, ).
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Hearing (telephonic), Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by United States of America, Mohammad Haroon Jan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Judgment Revoking Naturalization, #2 Text of Proposed Order Telephonic Hearing)(Beckett, Stephanie) Modified on 1/17/2020 to clarify as also filed on behalf of def & to correct the consent judgment motion event (cnw, ). Modified on 1/17/2020 (cnw, ).
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Email Service)(Beckett, Stephanie)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mohammad Haroon Jan, and returned to counsel for personal service via process server. (bes, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (bes, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO REVOKE NATURALIZATION against Mohammad Haroon Jan, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Haroon Jan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Haroon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Represented By: Samantha R. Miller
Represented By: Stephanie E. Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?