National Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Jose D. Pacheco, Africian Leshore, Samuel Thomas, Ardrill Sims, Ellis Leshore, Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc. and Brandy Price
Case Number: 2:2020cv00101
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company as to Jose D. Pacheco was returned with the following USPS notation: "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable to Forward". Plaintiff's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected. (kh, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company as to Samuel Thomas was returned with the following USPS notation: "Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward, Return to Sender". Plaintiff's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected. (kh, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USPS as to Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc. c/o Registered Agent Edwin E. Price with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Unclaimed, Unable to Forward." Plaintiff's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected. (dmn, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company as to Africian Leshore was returned with the following USPS notation: "Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward, Return to Sender". Plaintiff's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected. (kh, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Ellis Leshore for Ellis Leshore served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (kh, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Brandy Price for Brandy Price served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (kh, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by A. Sima for Ardrill Sims served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (kh, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Africian Leshore, Ellis Leshore, Jose D. Pacheco, Brandy Price, Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc., Ardrill Sims, Samuel Thomas and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Johnson, John)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (kh, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Africian Leshore, Ellis Leshore, Jose D. Pacheco, Brandy Price, Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc., Ardrill Sims, Samuel Thomas ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056788.), filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose D. Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Africian Leshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardrill Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis Leshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: John W. Johnson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?