Merriweather v. Createspace et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Shelton Merriweather
Defendant: Createspace, Kindle Direct Publishing, Amazon.com and Brandon Wrigley
Case Number: 2:2020cv00119
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Brandon Wrigley with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Addressee Unknown". (amf, )
March 30, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #15 Order sent to Brandon Wrigley was returned with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Addressee Unknown". (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com, Createspace, Kindle Direct Publishing re #14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Pate, Robert) Modified on 3/20/2020 to add the link to the #14 Notice (amf, ).
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading; On or before 4/24/2020, the Parties shall file their joint stipulation for dismissal or Dfts shall file an answer or responsive pleading. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/16/2020. (amf, )
March 13, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #13 MOTION - Attorney Harlan Irby Prater, IV for Amazon.com, Createspace, & Kindle Direct Publishing added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Createspace, Amazon.com, Kindle Direct Publishing; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint by Amazon.com, Createspace, Kindle Direct Publishing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pate, Robert)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Kevin Thornton for Createspace, served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (amf, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by "DG" for Kindle Direct Publishing, served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (amf, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by "DG" for Amazon.com, served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (amf, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by (No Signature) for Brandon Wrigley, served on 3/2/2020 (per USPS website), answer due 3/23/2020. (amf, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plf's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. #2 ) and Motion for Appointment of Attorney to Handle Plf's Case (Doc. #7 ) are hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/3/2020. (cnw, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Attorney to Handle Plaintiff's Case by Shelton Merriweather. (amf, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Shelton Merriweather re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (amf, )
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 USC 636, this case is referred to the U.S. Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 3/2/2020. (amf, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Createspace, Kindle Direct Publishing, & Brandon Wrigley; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Shelton Merriweather; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Shelton Merriweather. (amf, )
February 20, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shelton Merriweather. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Createspace, Kindle Direct Publishing, Brandon Wrigley (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602056874), filed by Shelton Merriweather. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Filing Fee Receipt) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merriweather v. Createspace et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Createspace
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindle Direct Publishing
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Wrigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelton Merriweather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?