Adair v. G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marcus Adair
Defendant: G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00125
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT NOTICE by Marcus Adair of Settlement (Philipps, David) Modified on 4/16/2020 to clarify text to reflect as JOINT filed by Marcus Adair and G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc. (qc/djy, ).
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Marcus Adair re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Philipps, David) (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/23/2020 to correct erroneous main pdf document to secure PDF) (qc/djy, ).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/10/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/20/2020. (amf, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plf Marcus Adair; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc.. (Moore, Neal)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc..(Moore, Neal)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Jessica Stout for G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (djy, )
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 and #4 Motions for David Philipps & Mary Philipps Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/2/2020. (djy, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Mary Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602056937.) by Marcus Adair. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for David Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602056936.) by Marcus Adair. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Wayne Botes on behalf of Marcus Adair (djy, )
February 24, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marcus Adair. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056935.), filed by Marcus Adair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 fee receipt)(djy, ) Modified on 2/27/2020 to clarify text reflect as CLASS ACTION (qc/djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adair v. G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Adair
Represented By: Bradford Wayne Botes
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: David Joseph Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc.
Represented By: Neal DeWitt Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?