Head et al v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery Rust, Jeri Ford, Betty Head and Theresa Holmes
Defendant: MHM Correctional Services, LLC, Jimmy Patrick, Leon Bollings, Jefferson Dunn, MHM Health Professionals, Bradrick Files, Cynthia Stewart, MHM Correctional Services, Ruth Naglich, Wexford Health Services, Inc., MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Leon Bolling and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00132
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Sever filed by Jeri Ford, Betty Head, Theresa Holmes, Jeffery Rust. (Ward, Nicolette)
April 21, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Sever filed by Betty Head. (Ward, Nicolette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2020: #1 Corrected Certificate of service) (am, ).
April 2, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Sever by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Piggott, Philip)
March 31, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by MHM Correctional Services, Inc.. (Dedmon, Ty)
March 31, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever by MHM Correctional Services, Inc.. (Dedmon, Ty)
March 31, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by MHM Correctional Services, Inc..(Dedmon, Ty)
March 23, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources, Inc. re #17 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Piggott, Philip)
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Wexford Health Sources, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Dft Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (amf, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wexford Health Sources, Inc..(Piggott, Philip)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: GRANTING the #11 Motion for Antonio M. Romanucci & Nicolette A. Ward to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 3/11/2020. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 13 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re: #11 Motion for Nicolette Ward $75.00, receipt number 4602057186. (am, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 12 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re: #11 Motion for Antonio Romanucci $75.00, receipt number 4602057185. (am, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for Antonio M. Romanucci & Nicolette A. Ward to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeri Ford, Betty Head, Theresa Holmes, Jeffery Rust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McGuire, Joseph) Modified on 3/11/2020 to add attorneys(am, ).
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Leon Bolling, Jefferson Dunn, Bradrick Files, Ruth Naglich, Jimmy Patrick, & Cynthia Stewart and returned to counsel for personal service. (am, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jeri Ford, Betty Head, Theresa Holmes, Jeffery Rust. (am, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Wexford Health Sources, Inc. served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020, filed by Jeffery Rust, Jeri Ford, Betty Head, Theresa Holmes. (am, ) Modified on 2/28/2020 to reflect correct file date (am, ).
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed MHM Correctional Services, Inc. served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020, filed by Jeffery Rust, Jeri Ford, Betty Head, Theresa Holmes. (am, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Wexford Health Sources, Inc. and returned to counsel for personal service (am, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jeri Ford. (am, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Theresa Holmes. (am, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jeffery Rust. (am, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Betty Head. (am, )
February 24, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jeri Ford, Betty Head, Theresa Holmes, Jeffery Rust. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT at Law against Leon Bolling, Jefferson Dunn, Bradrick Files, MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Ruth Naglich, Jimmy Patrick, Cynthia Stewart, Wexford Health Sources, Inc. filed by Jeffery Rust, Jeri Ford, Betty Head, Theresa Holmes. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602056944.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Head et al v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Correctional Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Bollings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Health Professionals
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Represented By: Ty Edward Dedmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradrick Files
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Correctional Services
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Represented By: Ty Edward Dedmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Naglich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Correctional Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Represented By: Ty Edward Dedmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Bolling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Rust
Represented By: Joseph Mitchell McGuire
Represented By: Nicolette Ward
Represented By: Antonio Romanucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeri Ford
Represented By: Joseph Mitchell McGuire
Represented By: Nicolette Ward
Represented By: Antonio Romanucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Head
Represented By: Joseph Mitchell McGuire
Represented By: Nicolette Ward
Represented By: Antonio Romanucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Holmes
Represented By: Joseph Mitchell McGuire
Represented By: Nicolette Ward
Represented By: Antonio Romanucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?