Canal Insurance Company v. Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Canal Insurance Company
Defendant: Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00157
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding Judge. Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr; Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Allan, Aria)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 26(f) ORDER: The parties are reminded of the obligation, imposed by Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to confer and to develop a proposed discovery plan. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than April 22, 2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/22/2020 as further out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/1/2020. (kh, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Accordingly, any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judges jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before March 25, 2020. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 3/11/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 3/11/2020. (kh, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Canal Insurance Company, Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Inc. (kh, )
March 5, 2020 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Inc. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Inc..(kh, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (kh, )
March 5, 2020 COMPLAINT against Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Inc., filed by Canal Insurance Company.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-2020-900114.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602047123) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canal Insurance Company v. Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canal Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin Matthew Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: John Garland Smith
Represented By: Kelly Fitzgerald Pate
Represented By: Aria Bianca Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?