Williams v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dennis Williams
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00161
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Received email from Southern District of Florida regarding receipt of e-transfer case; Southern District of Florida case number assigned as 9:20-cv-80513. (No pdf attached to this entry)(kh, )
March 24, 2020 Case transferred to Southern District of Florida. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (kh, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 3/24/2020 by the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation transferring this action to the USDC for the Southern District of Florida. (kh, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dennis Williams. (Pope, Neal)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Dennis Williams (kh, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and returned to counsel for personal service. (kh, )
March 6, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dennis Williams. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057129.), filed by Dennis Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Williams
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Neal Kirkland Pope
Represented By: Courtney Lynn Mohammadi
Represented By: Caroline G. McGlamry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?