McNeal et al v. Genpak, LLC et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Tonya McNeal and Cedrick Grandison
Defendant: Kathy Sawchuk and Genpak, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00197
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that plfs shall respond to the #5 motion to dismiss on or before 5/22/2020. Defs may file a reply on or before 5/29/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/27/2020. (cnw, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tonya McNeal. (cnw, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cedrick Grandison. (cnw, )
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 to Magistrate Judge Honorable Susan Russ Walker for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/27/2020. (cnw, )
March 26, 2020 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Genpak, LLC, Kathy Sawchuk. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #5 for pdf) (cnw, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Genpak, LLC, Kathy Sawchuk. (Parten, Matthew)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Correction re #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, #3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, to attach corrected PDF documents to correct the defendant's name in the style of the case. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main Document Entry #2 , #2 Corrected Main Document Entry #3 )(cnw, )
March 26, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #2 CDS- Attorney Matthew R Parten, Elizabeth Brannen Carter for Kathy Sawchuk added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Genpak, LLC,. (Parten, Matthew) Modified on 3/26/2020 to remove Kathy Sawchuk as a filer (cnw, ). (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/26/2020 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the defendant's name in the style of the case) (cnw, ). Modified on 3/26/2020 (cnw, ).
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kathy Sawchuk. (Parten, Matthew) Modified on 3/26/2020 to remove Genpak, LLC as a filer (cnw, ). (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/26/2020 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the defendant's name in the style of the case) (cnw, ). Modified on 3/26/2020 (cnw, ).
March 19, 2020 COMPLAINT against Genpak, LLC, Kathy Sawchuk, filed by Tonya McNeal, Cedrick Grandison.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Genpak, LLC from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-2020-000105.90. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057376) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal et al v. Genpak, LLC et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedrick Grandison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Sawchuk
Represented By: Matthew R Parten
Represented By: Elizabeth Brannen Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genpak, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R Parten
Represented By: Elizabeth Brannen Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?