Lyons v. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Geneva Lyons
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, OSARTIS GmbH, Howmedica International S de R.L., aap Biomaterials GmbH and Howmedica Osteonics Corporation doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics
Case Number: 2:2020cv00245
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation re #7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Burnett, Samantha)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to OSARTIS GmbH and returned to counsel for personal service. (kh, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Howmedica Osteonics Corporation; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation.(Burnett, Samantha)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Howmedica Osteonics Corporation served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (djy, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Geneva Lyons re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Duplechin, Ryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corporation; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Geneva Lyons; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
April 10, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Geneva Lyons. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Howmedica International S de R.L., Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, OSARTIS GmbH ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057579.), filed by Geneva Lyons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Represented By: Samantha Katharyn Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSARTIS GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica International S de R.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aap Biomaterials GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics
Represented By: Samantha Katharyn Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Lyons
Represented By: Ryan James Duplechin
Represented By: William Roger Smith, III
Represented By: Wesley Chadwick Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?