Tucker v. Thomas et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Eddie Lee Tucker
Defendant: Jimmy Thomas and V. Thomlin
Case Number: 2:2020cv00269
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Received email from ALND regarding receipt of e-transfer case; ALND case number assigned 7:20-cv-00720. (No pdf attached to this entry.) (dmn, )
May 21, 2020 Case transferred to USDC, Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to clerk.(dmn, ) (no pdf)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION: It is ORDERED as follows: (1) The magistrate judge's recommendation (doc. no. #3 ) is adopted. (2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (3) The motion to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. no. #2 ) is left for resolution by the transferee court. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer. This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(dmn, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/28/2020. (dmn, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Eddie Lee Tucker. (imm, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Jimmy Thomas, V. Thomlin, filed by Eddie Lee Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Request Slip to Business Officer, #2 Letter to Chaplain, #3 Inmate Request Slip to Warden, #4 Inmate Request Slip re Financial Statement, #5 Crazy Crow Trading Post)(imm, ) Modified on 4/27/2020 to include actual exhibit descriptions. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Thomas et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Lee Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Thomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?