Poole v. Marshall (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: David Lawrence Poole
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall and State of Alabama
Case Number: 2:2020cv00270
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: W Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the #5 order entered on this date adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Judgment is entered in favor of the def and against the plf and this case is summarily DISMISSED prior to service of process. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cwl, )
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) The #4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2) The plf's claims attacking the fact or duration of his incarceration on the consecutive life sentences imposed for his possession of obscene matter convictions entered against him in 1990 by the Circuit Court of DeKalb County, Alabama are DISMISSED without prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as such claims provide no basis for relief in the instant cause of action. 3) This case is DISMISSED without prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). A separate Final Judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/27/2020. (cwl, )
May 26, 2020 No objections filed to the #4 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The plf's claims attacking the fact or duration of his incarceration on the consecutive life sentences imposed for his possession of obscene matter convictions entered against him in 1990 by the Circuit Court of DeKalb County, Alabama be dismissed without prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as such claims provide no basis for relief in the instant cause of action; 2. This case be dismissed without prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/1/2020. (cnw, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at the Limestone Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/28/2020. (furn: cashier) (cnw, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by David Lawrence Poole. (es, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Steven T. Marshall, filed by David Lawrence Poole.(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poole v. Marshall (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lawrence Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?