James v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tommy E. James
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00272
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #3 Order signed by Social Security Administration for Andrew Saul served on 5/4/2020. (wcl, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #3 Order signed by Emily S. for US Attorney General served on 5/5/2020. (wcl, )
May 6, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 CONSENT - Attorney James Joseph DuBois for Andrew Saul added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge e-signed by Counsel for Andrew Saul. (bes, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge e-signed by Counsel for Tommy E. James. (bes, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #3 Order signed by illegible for Social Security Administration Office of Regional Chief Council served on 5/1/2020. (bes, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, & #3 Order signed by Jordan Johnson for US Attorney's Office served on 4/29/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (am, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, and U.S. Attorney General; Mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint and #3 Order. (bes, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plf to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; dft's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing. Copies mailed to counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/28/2020. (bes, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tommy E. James. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(imm, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Tommy E. James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy E. James
Represented By: Brian Roy Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?