Ledbetter v. Health Care Unit et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: James A. Ledbetter
Defendant: Nurse Pettaway, Health Care Unit, Sergeant Williams, Patrice Richie Jones and Antonio McClain
Case Number: 2:2020cv00276
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 7/15/2020 the correctional dfts shall file a supplement to their special report, supported by affidavits and any relevant prison records, which addresses any interaction they may have had with the plf on either 12/31/2019 and the early morning of 1/1/2020 regarding the plf's attempt to gain access to medical treatment for his injured hip. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/15/2020. (wcl, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 18 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Officer Howard, Sgt. Marshall, Officer Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Christian Robinson, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Mardis Howard, #3 Exhibit C Affidavit of Brittany Marshall)(Piggott, Philip)
June 10, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; CMRRR service package containing #5 Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint and #8 Order sent to Nurse Pettaway was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable To Forward, This Employee Is On A Leave Of Absence." (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER construing #15 MOTION to Dismiss as a Notice of Dismissal; it is ORDERED that Sgt. Johnson is DISMISSED as a party to this case without prejudice pursuant to Plf's #15 Notice of Dismissal; further ORDERED that this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge to which it is assigned for further appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/9/2020. (wcl, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON MOTION denying #14 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/9/2020. (wcl, )
June 8, 2020 NOTICE of Dismissal by James A. Ledbetter, as construed in the court's #17 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #15 for pdf) (wcl, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Party by James A. Ledbetter. (wcl, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by James A. Ledbetter. (wcl, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Nurse Pettaway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nurse Pettaway re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Piggott, Philip)
June 3, 2020 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Nurse Pettaway. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Nurse Pettaway; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Attachment)(wcl, )
June 3, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re #10 Waiver of Service Executed, to correct the docket text to also reflect as a notice of filing acknowledgment and to reset the answer deadline for 6/24/2020 as directed in the court's #8 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
May 29, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #10 NOTICE - Attorney Philip Piggott for Nurse Pettaway added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
May 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Nurse Pettaway answer due 6/24/2020. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Acknowledgment and WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nurse Pettaway. Nurse Pettaway waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip) Modified on 6/3/2020 to correct the docket text to also reflect as a notice of filing acknowledgment and to reset the answer deadline for 6/24/2020 as directed in the court's #8 Order (wcl, ).
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #5 Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint and #8 Order signed by O. Hicks for: Officer Howard served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/24/2020; Sgt. Johnson served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/24/2020; Sgt. Marshall served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/24/2020; Nurse Pettaway served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/24/2020; Officer Robinson served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (wcl, )
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 6/24/2020; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with amended complaint to the dfts and regular mail to ALDOC General Counsel and Counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 5/15/2020. (wcl, )
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION denying as moot #6 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 5/15/2020. (wcl, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by James A. Ledbetter. (wcl, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Nurse Pettaway, Sgt. Marshall, Officer Robinson, Officer Howard, Sgt. Johnson, filed by James A. Ledbetter.(wcl, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 5/19/2020 the plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; The plf is advised that the amended complaint will supersede the initial complaint filed in this case, as further set out in order; copy of Inmate 1983 Complaint form mailed as directed. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/28/2020. (wcl, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Bullock CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/28/2020. (furn: cashier) (wcl, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by James A. Ledbetter. (imm, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Health Care Unit, Patrice Richie Jones, Antonio McClain, Nurse Pettaway, Sergeant Williams, filed by James A. Ledbetter.(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledbetter v. Health Care Unit et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Pettaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?