Johnson v. Streeter et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Domonic B. Johnson
Defendant: B. Williams, Katrice Crawford, Maurice K. Spencer, William Streeter and Gerald Tippins
Case Number: 2:2020cv00322
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON MOTION: GRANTING Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Extension of Time; GRANTING Plaintiff an extension from 6/23/2020, to and including 7/14/2020, to comply with the court's 5/19/2020, #3 order that he submit an initial partial filing fee to the court in the amount of $19.83; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish a copy of this order to the account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/1/2020. (Furnished: Cashier; Mailed to Account Clerk at KCF, as directed) (am, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Deadline to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee by Domonic B. Johnson. (am, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that the #4 motion is GRANTED to the extent addressed in this order. Plaintiff is advised: (i) this case is pending on his complaint; (ii) Plaintiff is under order entered 5/19/2020, as extended by order of 6/11/2020, to file an initial partial filing fee of $19.83 by 6/23/2020 (see Docs. #3 , #5 ); and (iii) pending receipt of the initial filing fee, the court will enter any further order or Recommendation as deemed necessary and appropriate; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish Plaintiff with a copy of the docket sheet for this action. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/11/2020. (Mailed w/copy of Docket Sheet, as directed) (am, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: GRANTING the #4 Motion for Extension of Time; GRANTING the plaintiff an extension from 6/9/2020, to and including 6/23/2020, to comply with the court's 5/19/2020, #3 order that he submit an initial partial filing fee to the court in the amount of $19.83; DIRECTING the clerk to furnish a copy of this order to the account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/11/2020. (Mailed to account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility, as directed) (Furnished: Cashier) (am, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Deadline to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee; MOTION for Status by Domonic B. Johnson. (am, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Original Signature Page) (am, ).
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $19.83 be paid on or before 6/9/2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; GRANTING the #2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/19/2020. (am, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Domonic B. Johnson. (imm, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Katrice Crawford, Maurice K. Spencer, William Streeter, Gerald Tippins, B. Williams, filed by Domonic B. Johnson.(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Streeter et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domonic B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrice Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice K. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Streeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Tippins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?