J.L. Lane Lending, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Plaintiff: J.L. Lane Lending, LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv00340
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hayslip, Victor)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition (Response to Order to Show Cause) re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss filed by J.L. Lane Lending, LLC. (Pescia, Leslie) Modified on 6/19/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ).
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cwl, )
June 10, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Adams: #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank National Association.(Hayslip, Victor)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that on or before 6/18/2020, the plf shall show cause why the #5 motion should not be granted; The def shall file a reply on or before 6/25/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 6/4/2020. (cwl, )
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment. The parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 6/12/2020, as further set out in order. Do NOT electronically file the reassignment nor consent form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 6/4/2020. (cwl, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Hayslip, Victor)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PARTIES) J.L. Lane Lending, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (cwl, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (cwl, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Wells Fargo Bank National Association re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(cwl, )
May 22, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by J.L. Lane Lending, LLC. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )
May 22, 2020 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed by J.L. Lane Lending, LLC. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cwl, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank National Association from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-cv-20-900611.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058016) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 receipt) (cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.L. Lane Lending, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L. Lane Lending, LLC
Represented By: Leslie Leeann Pescia
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Victor Lee Hayslip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?