Williams v. Henline et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Cornelius Webster, Kareem A. Jones, Michael D. Collins, Jr., Zachary L. Williams and James R. Gann
Defendant: Kay Ivey, Captain Tuck, Officer Templin, Lieutenant Richardson, Officer Tidwell, Officer Carlton, Officer Ryan, James Stroud, Susan Moncrief, Officer Evans, Officer Patten, Officer Shulle, Officer Oliver, Officer Hill, Officer Bell, Warden Estes, Officer Thornton, Sgt. Ragsdale, Officer Roy, Officer Casablanco, Officer Weldon, Officer Kodya, Lt. Watkins, Robert Henline, Officer Ricks, Officer Unger, Tracy Jackson, Sgt. Heard, Sgt. Davidson and Sgt. Haynie
Case Number: 2:2020cv00345
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: DIRECTING the Clerk to 1) Undertake appropriate measures to return to the plf the $ 27.00 partial filing fee received on 6/22/2020; 2) Remand payment of the $ 27.00 filing fee to the account clerk at the Elmore County Jail for deposit to the plf's inmate account at that facility; 3) Not accept any additional payments from jail officials or the plf with respect to payment of the filing fee associated with this case; it is ORDERED that the inmate account clerk at the Elmore County Jail shall collect no further funds from the plf for purposes of payment of any portion of the filing fee attendant to this case; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Elmore County Jail and dft Henline. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/24/2020. (Furnished: Cashier & Finance) (amf, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 Partial filing fee received: $ 27.00, receipt number 4602058306. (amf, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT construing the #11 motion to dismiss as a Notice of Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to plf's #11 notice of dismissal; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 6/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STRIKING the #12 letter entered on the docket on 6/17/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/18/2020. (djy, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MOTION construing #11 motion to contact a motion to vacate collection of the filing fee in this case; directing that: (1) the #11 motion to vacate be GRANTED to the extent addressed in this order; (20 the #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment be and is hereby VACATED to the extent it requires payment of an initial partial filing fee and provides those persons having custody of the plaintiff with authority to withhold funds from the plf's inmate account for payment of the filing fee in this case; (3) No further funds be collected by jail officials from the plf for purposes of payment of any portion of the filing fee attendant to this case; directing the clerk to: (1) Undertake appropriate measures to return to the plf the $23.67 initial partial filing fee received on 6/3/2020; (2)Remand payment of the $23.67 filing fee to the account clerk at the Elmore County Jail for deposit to the plf's inmate account at that facility; (3) not accept any additional payments from jail officials or the plf with respect to payment of the filing fee associated with this case; (4) provide a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/17/2020. Furnished to cashier & finance. Mailed to acct clerk, as directed.(djy, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 (STRICKEN pursuant to #14 order) Received letter from Elmore County Sheriff's Dept that James Gann and Cornelius Webster have been released from custody. (djy, ) Modified on 6/18/2020 (djy, ).
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Zachary L. Williams. (djy, ). Added MOTION to Vacate on 6/17/2020 pursuant to #13 order (qc/djy, ).
June 8, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of #7 Order sent to Cornelius Webster returned with the following USPS notation, "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward; Released." (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that on or before 6/19/2020, plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; To aid Plaintiff in filing an amended complaint in response to the directives of this order, the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints, and Plaintiff shall use this form in filing his amended complaint. The amended complaint will supersede the initial complaint. Thus, the court will consider only those claims set forth in the amended complaint and the defendant(s) named in the amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/4/2020. Mailed with complaint form, as directed.(djy, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 Received partial Filing fee: $ 23.67, receipt number 4602058127 (djy, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $23.67 be paid on or before 6/18/2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350 fee is paid in full; granting #2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/29/2020. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the clerk to: (1) Assign the present cause of action to Plaintiff Zachary Williams and open separate civil actions for each of the other Plaintiffs named in this complaint; (2) Assign the newly opened cases in accordance with this court's normal assignment procedures; (3) Strike the requests for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiffs Collins,Gann, Jones and Webster (Docs. #3 , #4 , #5 & #6 ) from the docket in this case;(4) Place a copy of the complaint (Doc. #1 ), the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by the inmate-plaintiff to which the newly opened civil action is assigned and a copy of this order in the newly opened case files; (5) Refer the newly opened cases to the appropriate Magistrate Judge for further proceedings upon completion of the foregoing directives. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/29/2020. (djy, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 (STRICKEN pursuant to #7 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Cornelius Webster. (Attachments: #1 application to proceed)(djy, ) Modified on 5/29/2020 (djy, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 (STRICKEN pursuant to #7 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Kareem A. Jones. (Attachments: #1 application to proceed)(djy, ) Modified on 5/29/2020 (djy, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 (STRICKEN pursuant to #7 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by James R. Gann. (Attachments: #1 application to proceed)(djy, ) Modified on 5/29/2020 (djy, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 (STRICKEN pursuant to #7 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Michael D. Collins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 application to proceed)(djy, ) Modified on 5/29/2020 (djy, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Zachary L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 application to proceed)(djy, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Officer Bell, Officer Carlton, Officer Casablanco, Warden Estes, Officer Evans, Sgt. Heard, Robert Henline, Officer Hill, Kay Ivey, Tracy Jackson, Officer Kodya, Susan Moncrief, Officer Oliver, Officer Patten, Sgt. Ragsdale, Lieutenant Richardson, Officer Ricks, Officer Roy, Officer Ryan, Officer Shulle, James Stroud, Officer Templin, Officer Thornton, Officer Tidwell, Captain Tuck, Officer Unger, Lt. Watkins, Officer Weldon, filed by Michael D. Collins, Jr, Zachary L. Williams, Cornelius Webster, Kareem A. Jones, James R. Gann.(djy, ) Modified on 5/28/2020 to correct filed date as of 5/26/2020 (qc/djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Henline et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Tuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Templin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Moncrief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Shulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Ragsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Casablanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kodya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Henline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Collins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?