Hooks v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Demetrius Hooks
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00377
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Received email from California Northern District regarding receipt of e-transfer case; California Northern District case number assigned as 3:20-cv-04199. (No pdf attached to this entry (cwl, )
June 23, 2020 Case transferred to Northern District of California. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (NO pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 6/17/2020 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC for the Northern District of California. (cwl, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Demetrius Hooks re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Demetrius Hooks; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
June 4, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Demetrius Hooks. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058158.), filed by Demetrius Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooks v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Hooks
Represented By: Kristian W Rasmussen, III
Represented By: Randi Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?