McQueen v. Grocery Store et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Marcus D. McQueen
Defendant: Grocery Store and Joppa Court
Case Number: 2:2020cv00380
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Received email from ALND regarding receipt of e-transfer case; ALND case number assigned as 2:20-cv-01034. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
July 21, 2020 Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 7/21/2020. (cwl, )
July 21, 2020 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/2/2020. (cwl, )
June 5, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marcus D. McQueen. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Marcus D. McQueen. (hrs, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Grocery Store, Joppa Court, filed by Marcus D. McQueen. (Attachments: #1 letter)(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQueen v. Grocery Store et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joppa Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus D. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?