Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. Soggy Bottom Tavern, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Nataska Rudolph, Soggy Bottom Tarvern, LLC and Soggy Bottom Tavern, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00388
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Defendant Soggy Bottom Tavern, LLC with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (amf, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Lee, Marcus) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/16/2020 to attach a properly published PDF) (amf, ). Modified on 6/16/2020 (amf, ).
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Soggy Bottom Tavern, LLC & Nataska Rudolph; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement.(amf, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plf Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plf Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (amf, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (amf, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Nataska Rudolph, Soggy Bottom Tavern, LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602058210), filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, ) Modified on 6/12/2020 to reflect the proper spelling of Dft Soggy Bottom Tavern, LLC (amf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. Soggy Bottom Tavern, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Marcus Wesley Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nataska Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soggy Bottom Tarvern, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soggy Bottom Tavern, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?