Brinson v. Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert R. Brinson
Defendant: Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc., Joe Riley, Leah Pierce and Jennifer Stevens
Case Number: 2:2020cv00395
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 11112
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Stevens. (May, Thomas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Leah Pierce. (May, Thomas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joe Riley re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (May, Thomas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc. re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (May, Thomas)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Robert R. Brinson. (Walker, Constance)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Robert R. Brinson re #12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Gallion, Thomas)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Robert R. Brinson; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendants Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc. & Joe Riley; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc., Joe Riley. (Lawley, Hugh)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that the #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court is set for Submission, without oral argument, on 7/27/2020, with any opposition brief due by 7/20/20, and any reply to the opposition due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/6/2020. (djy, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Robert R. Brinson.(Gallion, Thomas)
July 3, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to state court filed by Robert R. Brinson. (Walker, Constance) .
July 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to state court by Robert R. Brinson. (Walker, Constance) Modified on 7/6/2020 to correct event code to reflect as remand to state court (qc/djy, ).
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 - 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Leah Pierce.(amf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2020: #1 Corrected Signature Pages) (amf, ).
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 - 1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Counterclaim by Jennifer Stevens.(amf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2020: #1 Corrected Signature Pages) (amf, ).
June 15, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leah Pierce, Jennifer Stevens. (No PDF attached to this entry - See docs #4 & #5 for PDFs) (amf, )
June 15, 2020 COUNTERCLAIM against Robert R. Brinson, filed by Jennifer Stevens. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #4 for PDF)(amf, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 - 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Joe Riley.(amf, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 - 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc..(amf, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc., Joe Riley from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-cv-2020-900643.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602058234) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 2 - Consent to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
June 11, 2020 COMPLAINT against Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc., Leah Pierce, Joe Riley, Jennifer Stevens, filed by Robert R. Brinson. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF)(amf, )
June 11, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Robert R. Brinson. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF) (amf, )
June 11, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc., Joe Riley. (No PDF attached to this entry - See docs #2 & #3 for PDFs) (amf, )
June 11, 2020 CONSENT to Removal by Leah Pierce, Jennifer Stevens. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 3 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brinson v. Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hospital and Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Kelly May, Sr.
Represented By: Hugh Cannon Lawley
Represented By: Walter Jasper Price, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Riley
Represented By: Thomas Kelly May, Sr.
Represented By: Hugh Cannon Lawley
Represented By: Walter Jasper Price, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Pierce
Represented By: Thomas Kelly May, Sr.
Represented By: Hugh Cannon Lawley
Represented By: Walter Jasper Price, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Stevens
Represented By: Thomas Kelly May, Sr.
Represented By: Hugh Cannon Lawley
Represented By: Walter Jasper Price, III
Represented By: William Robert Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. Brinson
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Represented By: Constance Caldwell Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?