Potts v. United States of America (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Demetriss Santell Potts
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00411
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Received email from FLMD regarding receipt of e-transfer case; FLMD case number assigned as 5:20-cv-00326(NO PDF attached to this entry) (kh, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The magistrate judge's recommendation (doc. no. #3 ) is adopted.(2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer. This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/16/2020. (kh, )
July 16, 2020 Case transferred to Middle District of Florida. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (no pdf attached to this entry)(kh, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida under 28 U.S.C. 1631. The Clerk is DIRECTED to take all necessary steps to amend the court docket to reflect the Warden of USP Coleman I is the proper respondent. Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/26/2020. (kh, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Demetriss Santell Potts.(kh, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 Copy of ORDER entered in 2:12cr7-MHT.The clerk of the court is to strike defendant Demetriss Santell Potts's pro se motion for jail credit (doc. no. 69); open a new civil action under 28 U.S.C. 2241; and docket this motion in the newly opened civil action. (2) The clerk of the court shall also assign the newly opened civil action to the magistrate judge and district judge to whom the instant case is assigned and refer the case to the appropriate magistrate judge for further proceedings upon completion of the foregoing directives. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 6/18/2020.(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potts v. United States of America (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetriss Santell Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?