Fulmer v. Alabama State Employees Credit Union
Plaintiff: Stephanie Fulmer
Defendant: Alabama State Employees Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2020cv00417
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr., as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cwl, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Glenos, Amy)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties confer and submit a report based on the trial terms and scheduling order requirements of the Middle District of Alabama. The Rule 26(f) report shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/3/2020; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 8/3/2020. DO NOT FILE THE FORM ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/13/2020. (cwl, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEF) Alabama State Employees Credit Union. (cwl, )
July 13, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 ANSWER - Attorney Josh C Harrison for Alabama State Employees Credit Union added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alabama State Employees Credit Union. (Glenos, Amy)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alabama State Employees Credit Union.(Glenos, Amy)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Fulmer. Demarcus Oliver for Alabama State Employees Credit Union served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (cwl, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stephanie Fulmer re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (McPhillips, Julian)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alabama State Employees Credit Union and returned to counsel for personal service. (kh, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Stephanie Fulmer; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plf) Stephanie Fulmer. (cwl, )
June 16, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stephanie Fulmer.(No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama State Employees Credit Union ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058283.), filed by Stephanie Fulmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulmer v. Alabama State Employees Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama State Employees Credit Union
Represented By: Amy Quick Glenos
Represented By: Josh C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Fulmer
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Chase Elliot Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?