Dismuke v. Protective Insurance Company et al (MEMBER CASE)
Plaintiff: Jacquice Lorrisa Dismuke
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Protective Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00422
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
2 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED as follows:(1) Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's unopposed Motions to Consolidate (Doc. # 4, 2:20-CV-421; Doc. #5 , 2:20-CV-422) are GRANTED; (2) The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to consolidate the above-styled actions and to annotate the dockets to designate civil action number 2:20-CV-421 as the lead case;(3) The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to reassign Civil Action No. 2:20-CV-422 to the undersigned as the district judge and to Jerusha T. Adams as the magistrate judge; and (4) The parties shall make all filings in the lead case. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/22/2020. (kh, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Holtsford, Alex)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jacquice Lorrisa Dismuke; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Correction re #9 MOTION to Withdraw to correct main pdf document previously attached by e-filer. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main Document #9 )(am, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw of Attorney Charles P. Gaines by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Holtsford, Alex) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/20/2020) (am, ).
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jacquice Lorrisa Dismuke. (Lawrence, John)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon consideration of Defendant's #5 Motion to Consolidate, it is ORDERED that, on or before 7/8/2020, any opposing party shall show cause why the motion should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/24/2020. (No PDF attached to this entry)(bes, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Removal by Protective Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baggett, Evan) Modified on 6/24/2020 to clarify text as reflected in pleading(am, ).
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Holtsford, Alex)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jacquice Lorrisa Dismuke, Protective Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (am, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Protective Insurance Company.(am, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Protective Insurance Company. (am, )
June 17, 2020 CONSENT to #1 Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
June 17, 2020 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Protective Insurance Company. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
June 17, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (NO PDF - See doc #1 )(am, )
June 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jacquice Lorrisa Dismuke. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
June 17, 2020 COMPLAINT against Protective Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Jacquice Lorrisa Dismuke. (NO PDF - See doc #1 )(am, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Protective Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Coose County, AL, case number 22-CV-2020-900013.00. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602058286) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Farm State Court Answer, #3 Exhibit A, #4 B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dismuke v. Protective Insurance Company et al (MEMBER CASE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquice Lorrisa Dismuke
Represented By: John David Lawrence
Represented By: Kirby Dee Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles Pafford Gaines
Represented By: Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protective Insurance Company
Represented By: Evan Patrick Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?