Bowden et al v. Coast to Coast Cable, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Bowden and Catherine Bowden
Defendant: Coast to Coast Cable, Inc and Bruce P. Beaudry
Case Number: 2:2020cv00467
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
2 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson for 10/13/2021, in Montgomery, AL; Jury Trial set before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson for 12/6/2021 in Montgomery, AL; Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2020; Discovery due by 5/18/2021; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 6/15/2021; Mediation Notice due by 5/25/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/24/2020. (furn: calendar, ag)(cwl, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baker, Benjamin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bruce P. Beaudry, Coast to Coast Cable, Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Knott, Conley)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bruce P. Beaudry. (Austill, William) Modified on 7/23/2020 to clarify as satisfying #7 Deficiency notice (cwl, ).
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Benjamin Bowden, Catherine Bowden. (Baker, Benjamin)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is therefore the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the removing party has until 7/28/2020, to amend the notice of removal to allege jurisdiction sufficiently, see 28 U.S.C. 1653; otherwise this lawsuit shall be remanded to state court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/14/2020. (cwl, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bruce P. Beaudry; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
July 13, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bruce P. Beaudry, Coast to Coast Cable, Inc. (no pdf document attached to this entry -see docket entry #3 and #4 for pdf)(kh, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bruce P. Beaudry.(Austill, William)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Coast to Coast Cable, Inc.(Austill, William)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Alfred Austill on behalf of Bruce P. Beaudry, Coast to Coast Cable, Inc (Austill, William)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Coast to Coast Cable, Inc. (kh, )
July 8, 2020 COMPLAINT against Bruce P. Beaudry, Coast to Coast Cable, Inc, filed by Benjamin Bowden, Catherine Bowden.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bruce P. Beaudry, Coast to Coast Cable, Inc from Circuit Court of Pike County, AL, case number 55-CV-2020-900066.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058489) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowden et al v. Coast to Coast Cable, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast to Coast Cable, Inc
Represented By: Conley Walden Knott
Represented By: William Alfred Austill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce P. Beaudry
Represented By: Conley Walden Knott
Represented By: William Alfred Austill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Bowden
Represented By: Benjamin E. Baker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Bowden
Represented By: Benjamin E. Baker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?