Allegro v. Lexus
Plaintiff: Anthony Allegro
Defendant: Lexus
Case Number: 2:2020cv00481
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than August 12, 2020, as further set in order.Additionally, the parties were previously notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and their right to request reassignment. See Attached Explanation. As indicated in the notice of assignment, the parties must confirm their decision to consent to the Magistrate Judge in writing. Accordingly, any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before August 12, 2020. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/15/2020. (kh, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Anthony Allegro, Lexus (kh, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lexus.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #3 for pdf)(kh, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Amended Complaint w/ Jury Demand by Lexus.(kh, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lexus. (kh, )
July 10, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Anthony Allegro. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
July 10, 2020 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lexus, filed by Anthony Allegro.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
July 10, 2020 COMPLAINT against Lexus, filed by Anthony Allegro.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lexus from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-2020-000754.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058543) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Amended State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allegro v. Lexus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexus
Represented By: Rudolph Woods Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Gordon Sproule, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Allegro
Represented By: Julian Mason Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?