Allstate Property and Casualty Company v. Wilks
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Company
Defendant: Michael Wilks
Case Number: 2:2020cv00496
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that Dft shall file a response by 9/11/2020, and show cause why the #7 Motion to Dismiss Count Two of the Counterclaim should not be granted; Plf may file a reply by 9/18/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/28/2020. (wcl, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Michael Wilks; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Attachment) (wcl, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Michael Wilks. (wcl, )
August 26, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 MOTION - Attorney Joseph Lamar Cowan, II for Allstate Property and Casualty Company added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Count Two of the Counterclaim by Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Hart, J.)
August 6, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michael Wilks. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #6 for pdf) (wcl, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Allstate Property and Casualty Company by Michael Wilks.(Nicolau, Demosthenes)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by illegible for Michael Wilks served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (wcl, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Wilks; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement. (wcl, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (wcl, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (wcl, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Michael Wilks (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058561.), filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Property and Casualty Company v. Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wilks
Represented By: Demosthenes Athanasios Nicolau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: J. Mark Hart
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Reardon
Represented By: Joseph Lamar Cowan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?