McGill v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Randy McGill
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00588
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Received email from CA/ND regarding receipt of e-transfer case; CA/ND case number assigned as 3:20-cv-06247. (No pdf attached to this entry) (amf, )(amf, )
September 1, 2020 Case transferred to the Northern District of California; Electroincally transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Received certified copy of transfer order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of California. (amf, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Randy McGill; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Randy McGill; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
August 11, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Randy McGill. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058979.), filed by Randy McGill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGill v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy McGill
Represented By: Jackson Brett Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?