Vernon v. Vengroff Williams, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sherrie Vernon
Defendant: Vengroff Williams, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00597
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Vengroff Williams, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEF) Vengroff Williams, Inc. (cwl, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law by Vengroff Williams, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH - Complaint)(Zoghby, Alexander)
October 7, 2020 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vengroff Williams, Inc. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #6 for pdf) (cwl, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #2 CDS, #4 Summons signed by Lisa O. for Vengroff Williams, Inc. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (cwl, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vengroff Williams, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement (kh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Sherrie Vernon (kh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sherrie Vernon. (kh, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vengroff Williams, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059050.), filed by Sherrie Vernon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )
August 14, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sherrie Vernon. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vernon v. Vengroff Williams, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Vernon
Represented By: James Matthew Stephens
Represented By: Brooke Boucek Rebarchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vengroff Williams, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Garrett Zoghby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?