Jackson v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Willie Arthur Jackson
Defendant: Kay Ivey, Steven T. Marshall, John Crow, Monica McCoy and Jefferson S. Dunn
Case Number: 2:2020cv00600
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for (DEFS) John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, Steven T. Marshall, Monica McCoy. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
October 8, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #10 NOA - Attorney Carrie Ellis McCollum for John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, Steven T. Marshall, Monica McCoy added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, Steven T. Marshall, Monica McCoy. (Harmon, Bart)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bart Gregory Harmon on behalf of John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, Steven T. Marshall, Monica McCoy (Harmon, Bart)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #5 Order, signed by Barbara Baldwin for Jefferson S. Dunn, served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (amf, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint & #5 Order signed by Sharon B. for John Crow served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (cwl, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint & #5 Order signed by Sharon B. for Monica McCoy served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (cwl, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint & #5 Order signed by Pam Bye for Kay Ivey served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (cwl, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT on or before 10/19/2020; copies mailed to plf; mailed together with a copy of the complaint to General Counsel for the ALDOC; mailed by CMRRR with complaint on the individuals named as defs. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/18/2020. (cwl, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 3.00, receipt number 4602059414. (cwl, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $3.00 be paid on or before 9/8/2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at the Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/18/2020. (furn: cashier) (cwl, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Willie A. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 IFP Declaration)(hrs, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, Steven T. Marshall, Monica McCoy, filed by Willie A. Jackson.(hrs, ) Modified on 8/18/2020 to correct two of the def's names (cwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crow
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica McCoy
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Arthur Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?