Kister v. Jones (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Defendant: Patrice Richie Jones
Case Number: 2:2020cv00607
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT On or before 10/30/2020; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named def, to General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections, and to the Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/18/2020. (cwl, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION: considering #6 a motion to vacate immediate collection of the initial partial filing fee, it is ORDERED that: 1) Plf's motion (Doc. #6 ) is GRANTED to the extent addressed in this order; 2) The provision set forth in the order entered on 9/8/2020 (Doc. #5 ), which requires payment of an initial partial filing fee is VACATED; 3) The remaining directives set forth in the 9/8/2020, order-including the requirement regarding payment of the filing fee as funds become available to Plf (Doc. #5 at 2, para 1-2)-remain in full force and effect; The clerk is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/18/2020. (mailed to BCF) (cwl, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee When Funds Available, considered a MOTION to vacate immediate collection of the initial partial filing fee pursuant to the Court's #7 Order re #5 Order on MOTION, by John Andrew Kister. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(cwl, ) Modified on 9/18/2020 to clarify text & correct mtn event (cwl, ).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $37.97 be paid on or before 9/29/2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at the Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/8/2020. (furn: cashier) (cwl, ) Modified on 9/18/2020 to add The provision which requires payment of an initial partial filing fee is VACATED pursuant to the Court's #7 Order (cwl, ).
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John Andrew Kister. (cwl, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) On or before 9/4/2020, Plf shall submit an inmate account statement, as further set out in order; and 2) The Clerk of Court SEND a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/21/2020. (copy mailed to BCF as directed)(cwl, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by John Andrew Kister. (imm, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Patrice Richie Jones, filed by John Andrew Kister.(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kister v. Jones (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?