Davis v. Reverse Mortgage Solutions
Plaintiff: Adina Davis
Defendant: Reverse Mortgage Solutions
Case Number: 2:2020cv00632
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw Joshua S. Inman Attorney by Adina Davis. (am, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Adina Davis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(am, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Adina Davis by Reverse Mortgage Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Neel, Preston) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2020: #2 Corrected Certificate of service) (am, ).
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service to Pro Se Plaintiff by Reverse Mortgage Solutions (Neel, Preston) Modified on 9/4/2020 to clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ).
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Adina Davis, Reverse Mortgage Solutions. (am, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Reverse Mortgage Solutions. (am, )
August 28, 2020 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Reverse Mortgage Solutions. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
August 28, 2020 Petition for Injunctive Relief; Petition for Declaratory Judgment; & Damages against Reverse Mortgage Solutions, filed by Adina Davis. (NO PDF - See doc #1 )(am, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Reverse Mortgage Solutions from Circuit Court of Chilton County, AL, case number 14-CV-2020-000046.00. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602059193) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Reverse Mortgage Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adina Davis
Represented By: Joshua S. Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reverse Mortgage Solutions
Represented By: Spencer Ryan Mobley
Represented By: Preston H. Neel
Represented By: Preston H Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?