Goosby v. Briggs et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Causey Goosby
Defendant: Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. and Gary Lee Briggs
Case Number: 2:2020cv00766
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Barbara Causey Goosby; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Attachment)(wcl, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Barbara Causey Goosby. (James, QuiAndria)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gary Lee Briggs re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Burford, Steve) Modified on 10/2/2020 to add the link to the #4 notice (bes, ).
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Gary Lee Briggs; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Attachment)(wcl, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Barbara Causey Goosby. (wcl, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Gary Lee Briggs. (wcl, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Gary Lee Briggs re #1 Notice of Removal. (amf, )
September 24, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Barbara Causey Goosby. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 24, 2020 COMPLAINT against Gary Lee Briggs, Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc., filed by Barbara Causey Goosby. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gary Lee Briggs from Circuit Court of Lowndes County, Alabama, case number 45-cv-2020-900042.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059595) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Receipt)(wcl, ) Modified on 9/29/2020 to reflect no separate Exhibit 2 was provided (wcl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goosby v. Briggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Causey Goosby
Represented By: Quiandria James
Represented By: Charles James, II
Represented By: QuiAndria Jacquelynne James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lee Briggs
Represented By: Steve Ray Burford
Represented By: Lindsay Hembree Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?