Abbott et al v. Mega Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Touri Eugene Abbott and Phillip's Auto Recycling & Salvage, Inc.
Defendant: Mul-Ty Vibes, Inc., Patrice Lumumba Morgan and Mega Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00776
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrice Lumumba Morgan. (Corley, Jonathan)
November 20, 2020 Filing 15 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Mega Trucking, LLC.(Corley, Jonathan)
November 20, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Patrice Lumumba Morgan.(Corley, Jonathan)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 ALIAS Summons issued as to Mul-Ty Vibes, Inc. & Patrice Lumumba Morgan; Returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Reginald Daryl McDaniel on behalf of Touri Eugene Abbott, Phillip's Auto Recycling & Salvage, Inc. (McDaniel, Reginald)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Mega Trucking, LLC. (wcl, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mega Trucking, LLC. (Corley, Jonathan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Mega Trucking, LLC.(Corley, Jonathan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 & #3 Conflict Disclosure Statements signed by no signature for Mul-Ty Vibes, Inc. served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (wcl, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 & #3 Conflict Disclosure Statements signed by no signature for Patrice Lumumba Morgan served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (wcl, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 & #3 Conflict Disclosure Statements signed by OJY, 1482 C-19 for Mega Trucking, LLC served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (wcl, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mega Trucking, LLC, Mul-Ty Vibes, Inc., & Patrice Lumumba Morgan; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint, #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement, & #3 Conflict Disclosure Statement.(amf, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Touri Eugene Abbott, Phillip's Auto Recycling & Salvage, Inc. (kh, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Phillip's Auto Recycling & Salvage, Inc.. (kh, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Touri Eugene Abbott. (kh, )
September 28, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Touri Eugene Abbott, Phillip's Auto Recycling & Salvage, Inc.. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mega Trucking, LLC, Patrice Lumumba Morgan, Mul-Ty Vibes, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059612.), filed by Touri Eugene Abbott, Phillip's Auto Recycling & Salvage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott et al v. Mega Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mul-Ty Vibes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Lumumba Morgan
Represented By: Jonathan Keith Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mega Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Keith Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Touri Eugene Abbott
Represented By: Adam Eugene Parker
Represented By: Reginald Daryl McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip's Auto Recycling & Salvage, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Eugene Parker
Represented By: Reginald Daryl McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?