Holliman v. Dunn et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Jimmy Holliman, Richard Clay Martin, Aloysius Thaddeus Henry, Willie Curtis Walker and Cornelius Montrez Jackson
Defendant: Jeffery Baldwin, City, County, Commission of Elmore County, Alabama, Charmelle Luckie, Alabama Department of Corrections Personal Board Director, Alabama Department of Corrections, Elmore Health Department, Charles Graddick, Elmore County Courthouse, Charles McKee, Jefferson S. Dunn and Cheryl Price
Case Number: 2:2020cv00815
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 Response to Order re #5 Order by Jimmy Holliman. (amf, )
November 10, 2020 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jimmy Holliman. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #9 for PDF) (amf, )
November 5, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of #6 order sent to Cornelius Montrez Jackson returned with the following US Postal Service notation, "returned to sender, unable to forward". (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
October 26, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #5 Order sent to Cornelius Montrez Jackson was returned with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward". (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing that on or before 11/2/2020, plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints, and plf shall use this form in filing his amended complaint; the amended complaint shall therefore supersede the original complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/19/2020. Mailed with 1983 inmate complaint form, as directed.(djy, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Elmore Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/16/2020. (furn: cashier and acct clerk)(kh, )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Clerk of this court is hereby DIRECTED to: 1. Open separate civil actions for each Plaintiff named in this complaint and assign the present cause of action to Plaintiff Jimmy Holliman; 2. Assign the newly opened cases in accordance with this court's normal assignment procedures. 3. Strike the requests for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiffs Jackson and Walker (Docs. #3 and #4 ) from the docket in this case. 4. Place a copy of the complaint (doc. #1 ), the motion leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by the inmate-plaintiff to which the newly opened civil action is assigned, and a copy of this order in the newly opened case files. 5. Refer these case files to the appropriate Magistrate Judge for further proceedings upon completion of the foregoing directives. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/13/2020. Furnished Intake. (dmn, )
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining order, as further set out in order; this case, including the remaining requests for relief, are referred back to the Magistrate Judge for consideration. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 10/9/2020. (djy, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Willie Curtis Walker. (hrs, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Cornelius Montrez Jackson. (hrs, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jimmy Holliman. (hrs, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Alabama Department of Corrections Personal Board Director, Jeffery Baldwin, City, County, Commission of Elmore County, Alabama, Jefferson S. Dunn, Elmore County Courthouse, Elmore Health Department, Charles Graddick, Charmelle Luckie, Charles McKee, Cheryl Price, filed by Cornelius Montrez Jackson, Jimmy Holliman, Aloysius Thaddeus Henry, Richard Clay Martin, Willie Curtis Walker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit A)(hrs, )
October 9, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Aloysius Thaddeus Henry, Jimmy Holliman, Cornelius Montrez Jackson, Richard Clay Martin, Willie Curtis Walker. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ).(hrs, ).
October 9, 2020 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Aloysius Thaddeus Henry, Jimmy Holliman, Cornelius Montrez Jackson, Richard Clay Martin, Willie Curtis Walker.(No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holliman v. Dunn et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City, County, Commission of Elmore County, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charmelle Luckie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections Personal Board Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmore Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Graddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmore County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Holliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Clay Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aloysius Thaddeus Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Curtis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Montrez Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?