Jackson v. Dunn et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Cornelius Montrez Jackson
Defendant: Jeffery Baldwin, Alabama Department of Corrections, Charmelle Luckie, Alabama Department of Corrections Personal Board Director, Elmore Health Department, Cheryl Price, City, County, Commission of Elmore County, Alabama, Jefferson S. Dunn, Elmore County Courthouse, Charles McKee and Charles Graddick
Case Number: 2:2020cv00831
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #4 Order and #5 Order sent to Cornelius Montrez Jackson was returned with the following USPS Notation: "RTS, Deceased"(no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for #2 Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/16/2020. (kh, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return the last page of the complaint, Doc. 2 at page16, to Cornelius Jackson so that he may sign this page and then resubmit the page to the court for filing. It is therefore ORDERED that on or before November 5, 2020 Jackson shall sign his name on the page sent to him by the Clerk and return this page to the court. Jackson is cautioned that if he fails to comply with the directives of this order the Magistrate Judge will recommend dismissal of this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/16/2020. (kh, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Cornelius Montrez Jackson. (kh, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Alabama Department of Corrections Personal Board Director, Jeffery Baldwin, City, County, Commission of Elmore County, Alabama, Jefferson S. Dunn, Elmore County Courthouse, Elmore Health Department, Charles Graddick, Charmelle Luckie, Charles McKee, Cheryl Price, filed by Cornelius Montrez Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit A)(kh, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 Copy of ORDER entered in 2:20-cv-815-RAH severing case and directing that a new civil action be opened for this plaintiff, as further set out in order. (kh, )
October 13, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cornelius Montrez Jackson. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #2 for PDF) (kh, )
October 13, 2020 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Cornelius Montrez Jackson. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #2 for PDF) (kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Dunn et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charmelle Luckie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections Personal Board Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmore Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City, County, Commission of Elmore County, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmore County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Graddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Montrez Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?