Purvis v. United States of America et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Roderick Alexander Purvis
Defendant: United States of America and Roy Cheatham
Case Number: 2:2020cv00895
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Myron H Thompson
3 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of #4 order sent to Roderick Purvis returned in mail with the following U S Postal Service notation, "returned to sender, refused, unable to forward". (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) the Magistrate Judge's #3 Report and Recommendation is adopted; (2) this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631; directin the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; this case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/18/2020. (djy, )
December 18, 2020 Case transferred to District of Middle District of Florida. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (djy, )
December 18, 2020 Received email from Middle District of Florida acknowledging transfer of case. New case number in MD FL is 5:20cv609 (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
December 15, 2020 No objections filed to #3 report and recommendation (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the US District Court for the Middle District of Florida pursuant to 28 USC 1631; Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 11/18/2020. (djy, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Roderick Alexander Purvis. (NO IFP; NO FILING FEE) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (amf, )
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER (entered in 2:17-cr-15-MHT): It is ORDERED that: 1) The Clerk is to strike defendant Roderick Alexander Purvis's pro se motion for earned jail credit (doc. no. 61); open a new civil action under 28 USC 2241; and docket this motion in the newly opened civil action; 2) The Clerk shall also assign the newly opened civil action to the magistrate judge and district judge to whom the instant case is assigned and refer the case to the appropriate magistrate judge for further proceedings upon completion of the foregoing directives. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/3/2020. (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purvis v. United States of America et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Alexander Purvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?