Podolski v. United States of America Department of Defense, et al.
Plaintiff: Peter Podolski
Defendant: Department of Defense, United States Air Force Officer Training School, United States of America, Department of the Air Force, United States of America Department of the Air Force and United States of America Department of Defense
Case Number: 2:2020cv00935
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Air Force Officer Training School, United States of America Department of Defense, United States of America Department of the Air Force, U.S. Attorney, & and U.S. Attorney General; Returned to Counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Peter Podolski. (djy, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Civil cover sheet. (djy, )
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean Timmons. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/17/2020. (wcl, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Sean Timmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602060218.) by Peter Podolski. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Defense, Department of the Air Force, United States Air Force Officer Training School, ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602060217.), filed by Peter Podolski. (Attachments: #1 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2020 to attach original signature page: #2 corrected signature page) (qc/djy, ).
November 12, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Peter Podolski. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Podolski v. United States of America Department of Defense, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force Officer Training School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of the Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Podolski
Represented By: Sean C Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?