Francis-Mohamed et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Mohamed Mohamed and Samantha Francis-Mohamed
Defendant: Chad Wolf, US Department of Homeland Security, Nicolas Bartell, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Mark Koumans
Case Number: 2:2020cv01000
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Christopher M. Colavecchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/22/2020. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Samantha Francis-Mohamed and Mohamed Mohamed; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Michael Colavecchio ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602060505.) by Samantha Francis-Mohamed, Mohamed Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(bes, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nicolas Bartell, Mark Koumans, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602060504.), filed by Samantha Francis-Mohamed, Mohamed Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis-Mohamed et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Bartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Koumans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Mohamed
Represented By: Christopher M. Colavecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Francis-Mohamed
Represented By: Christopher M. Colavecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?