United States of America v. Strickland et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bonnie Sue Strickland
Garnishee: Regions Bank
Case Number: 2:2020mc03908
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, & #3 Writ of Garnishment, served on Regions Bank c/o Jessica Andres (Banker), on 4/15/2020.(amf, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, & #3 Writ of Garnishment, served on Bonnie Strickland, c/o A.J. Strickland, on 3/16/2020.(amf, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (amf, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (amf, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #3 Claim for Exemption Form, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form, #6 Affidavit of Michael R. Murphy) (amf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2020: #6 Affidavit of Michael R. Murphy) (amf, ). Modified on 3/2/2020 to attach the affidavit which was inadvertently omitted from the docket entry (amf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Strickland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Sue Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?