Butler v. Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cornelius Butler
Defendant: Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00006
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties confer and submit a report based on the trial terms and scheduling order requirements of the Middle District of Alabama, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/23/2021; Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the Clerk of the Court by 3/23/2021; Do NOT file the consent form nor the request for reassignment form electronically into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 3/2/2021. (bes, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Cornelius Butler by Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Enrollment Tuition Installment Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - Independent Contractor Operator Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Equipment Lease Purchase Agreement)(Eckhart, Christopher)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting the #12 and #13 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and that Attorneys Elizabeth M. Bolka and Christopher J. Eckhart are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Dft in this matter; Counsel should file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 2/9/2021. (bes, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 Pro Hac Vice filing fee received re #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Eckhart: $75.00, receipt number 4602061261. (bes, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice filing fee received re #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth M. Bolka: $75.00, receipt number 4602061262 (bes, )
January 29, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #12 AND #13 MOTIONS - Attorneys Christopher J. Eckhart and Elizabeth M. Bolka for Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of ERROR re #10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, which is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous duplicate docket entry; Counsel did not follow proper correction procedures and e-filed the corrected document at docket entry #11 . (bes, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Eckhart by Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ball, Charles) Modified on 1/29/2021 to reflect atty requesting admission and to clarify name of ex C (bes, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2021: #4 Federal Certificate of Good Standing) (bes, ).
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth M. Bolka by Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ball, Charles) Modified on 1/29/2021 to reflect atty requesting admission (bes, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2021: #3 Federal Certificate of Good Standing) (bes, ).
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc. re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Ball, Charles)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 (STRICKEN AS A DUPLICATE FILING PURSUANT TO THE #14 NOTICE OF ERROR) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc. re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Ball, Charles) (Main Document 10 replaced on 1/29/2021 to remove the editing ability from the PDF - no other changes made) (bes, ). Modified on 1/29/2021 (bes, ).
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 1/22/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.. (amf, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.. (Ball, Charles)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by illegible for Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc. served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (bes, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Cornelius Butler. (bes, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cornelius Butler. (bes, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602060793.), filed by Cornelius Butler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Request for Service by Certified Mail, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd Bros. Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bolka
Represented By: Christopher J. Eckhart
Represented By: Charles Steven Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Butler
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Evans
Represented By: Horace Earl Nix, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?