Gilliland v. LTD Acquisitions, LLC
Plaintiff: Tracey Gilliland
Defendant: LTD Acquisitions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00038
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement by Tracey Gilliland (Philipps, David)
March 2, 2021 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment and MOTION for Award of Damages by Tracey Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Group C, #5 Exhibit Group D)(Philipps, David)
March 2, 2021 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to LTD Acquisitions, LLC; Copies furnished to all parties. (amf, )
March 2, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Doyle: #13 MOTION for Default and an Award of Damages. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Tracey Gilliland against LTD Acquisitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attorney Declaration)(Philipps, David)
February 25, 2021 Copy of #11 Application & case file delivered to Clerk. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (cwl, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by CT Corporation for LTD Acquisitions, LLC, served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (amf, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to LTD Acquisitions, LLC.; mailed by CMRRR with #1 Complaint. (amf, )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and supporting documentation (Docs. #5 - 1, #5 - 2), it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/20/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry)(amf, )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and supporting documentation (Docs. #4 -1, #4 - 2), it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/20/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Tracey Gilliland. (amf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 75.00, receipt number 4602060948) by Tracey Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(amf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 75.00, receipt number 4602060949) by Tracey Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(amf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tracey Gilliland. (amf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tracey Gilliland. (amf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LTD Acquisitions, LLC (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602060947), filed by Tracey Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
January 15, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tracey Gilliland. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliland v. LTD Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTD Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Gilliland
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: David Joseph Philipps
Represented By: Bradford Wayne Botes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?