Belknap v. Baldwin et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Bruce Allen Belknap
Defendant: Jeffery Baldwin, Steven T. Marshall and State of Alabama
Case Number: 2:2021cv00072
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: W Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 3/23/2021, Belknap shall show cause why his 2254 petition should not be dismissed as it was not filed within AEDPA's one-year limitation period and for the other reasons asserted by Respondents. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 3/3/2021. (amf, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Habeas Petition by Jeffery Baldwin, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case action summary, #2 Exhibit B - Indictment, #3 Exhibit C - Guilty plea agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Order amending indictment, #5 Exhibit E - Sentencing order, #6 Exhibit F - Motion to withdraw guilty plea, #7 Exhibit G - Order denying motion to withdraw guilty plea, #8 Exhibit H - Case action summary - CC-13-319.60, #9 Exhibit I - Rule 32 petition, #10 Exhibit J - State's Motion to dismiss Rule 32 petition, #11 Exhibit K - Objection to motion to dismiss, #12 Exhibit L - Order denying Rule 32 petition, #13 Exhibit M - ACIS search results, #14 Exhibit N - Alacourt.com search results)(Wilkerson, Kristi)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jeffery Baldwin, Steven T. Marshall. (Wilkerson, Kristi)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Oggs Wilkerson on behalf of Jeffery Baldwin, Steven T. Marshall (Wilkerson, Kristi)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #6 Order, signed by J. Taylor for Steven T. Marshall, served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (amf, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #6 Order, signed by CAP C19 for Jeffery Baldwin, served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (amf, )
February 16, 2021 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Defendants Jeffery Baldwin & Steven T. Marshall. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 3/2/2021, as further set out in Order; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Baldwin & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/8/2021. (am, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: GRANTING petitioner's #2 & #4 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this action under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/8/2021. (am, )
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Bruce Allen Belknap. (am, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: DIRECTING that by 2/10/2021, Belknap shall: (1) file a properly completed form for a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) submit a prison account statement, as further set out in Order; or Belknap shall submit the $5.00 filing fee for a 2254 petition; DIRECTING the Clerk to send Belknap a form for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide the account clerk at the Elmore Correctional Facility with a copy of this order, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 1/27/2021. (Mailed w/IFP form to plaintiff; Account clerk @ ECF, as directed) (am, )
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Bruce Allen Belknap. (hrs, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/27/2021to redact personal information contained in main pdf pursuant to the E-Government Rules) (am, ).
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Bruce Allen Belknap.(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belknap v. Baldwin et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Allen Belknap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Baldwin
Represented By: Kristi Oggs Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Represented By: Kristi Oggs Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?