Long v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: James Long
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 2:2021cv00095
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Walters, Jason)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/18/2021; directing counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 3/18/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/12/2021. (djy, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.(djy, )
March 8, 2021 ***Attorney Kriston Laney Gifford for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston added pursuant to #6 answer (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Walters, Jason)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Walters, Jason)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (djy, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff James Long. (amf, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James Long. (amf, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602061086), filed by James Long. (Attachments: #1 Request for Service by Certified Mail, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Jason Allen Walters
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Long
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: David Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?